Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/27/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/28/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/28/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/29/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/29/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/04/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/04/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/04/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/07/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/12/2009