Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/06/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2009