Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/24/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/07/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/24/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/02/2010