Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/19/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/26/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/26/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/23/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/23/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/28/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/29/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/29/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/30/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/07/2009