Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/28/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/29/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/17/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/13/2009