Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/17/2009