Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/20/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/26/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/26/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/03/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/03/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/04/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/23/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/26/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/09/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/23/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/23/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/24/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/24/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/21/2010