Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/26/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/28/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/28/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/12/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/23/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/26/2009
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/13/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010