Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/27/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/27/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/24/2009