Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/12/2010