Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/16/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/05/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/02/2009