Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/17/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/24/2009