Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/11/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/29/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/12/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/30/2010