Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/18/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/23/2009