Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/19/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/15/2010