Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/18/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/18/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/18/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/18/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/24/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/24/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2009