Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/17/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 03/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/29/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/10/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/09/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/16/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew