Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/27/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/27/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/28/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/02/2009