Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/31/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/28/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/28/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/30/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/07/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/08/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/14/2009