Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/17/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/26/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/04/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/23/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/11/2010