Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/01/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/01/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/21/2009