Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/25/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/25/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/25/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/26/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/26/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/26/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/30/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/30/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/02/2010