There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Security Priorities Resolution

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the paramount need to address the threat of international terrorism and protect the international security of the United States by reducing the number of and accessibility to nuclear weapons and preventing their proliferation, and directing a portion of the resulting savings towards child survival, hunger, and universal education, and calling on the President to take action to achieve these goals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/24/2009Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/24/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/27/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/26/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/24/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.278.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.278. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/2009)

Global Security Priorities Resolution - Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) the President should continue negotiations with other countries and unilateral initiatives to achieve nuclear arms reductions, and agree to the verifiable reduction of deployed U.S. and Russian nuclear weapons; (2) the Cooperative Threat Reduction (Nunn-Lugar) Program should be extended to requesting third countries; and (3) funds saved through nuclear arms reductions should be used for cooperative threat reduction and to alleviate problems affecting children and families that can contribute to support for international terrorism.