Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009