Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/20/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/20/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2009