Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/08/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/08/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 01/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/21/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/26/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/26/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/26/2009