Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/22/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/27/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/27/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/27/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/27/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/21/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2010