Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/02/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/11/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/08/2009