Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/09/2009