Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/12/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/02/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/22/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/04/2010