There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing heartfelt sympathy for the victims and families of the shootings in Geneva and Coffee Counties in Alabama, on March 10, 2009.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/28/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4850)
04/21/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
04/28/2009-12:54pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/28/2009-12:54pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4850)
04/28/2009-12:40pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 341.
04/28/2009-12:40pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4850-4852)
04/28/2009-12:40pmMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/23/2009Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
04/23/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/21/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/21/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/22/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/23/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/21/2009 Referred to
04/23/2009 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.341.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.341. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/28/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the heartfelt sympathy of the House of Representatives for the victims and families of the shootings in Geneva and Coffee Counties in Alabama on March 10, 2009.

Conveys the gratitude of the House to the city and county officials, and all the police, fire, sheriff, and emergency medical teams who responded swiftly to the scene and helped prevent further violence.