Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/22/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/28/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/16/2010