Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/06/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/19/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 12/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/02/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/08/2009