Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/27/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/30/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/08/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/17/2009