Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/15/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/15/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/21/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 01/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/26/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/26/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/27/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/28/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/28/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/2009