Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2010