Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/29/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/09/2009