Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/25/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/25/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/25/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/25/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/25/2009