Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/26/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2010