Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/30/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/30/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/30/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/30/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/30/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/30/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/30/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/30/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/30/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/13/2009