Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/29/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/30/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2009