Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2009