Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/12/2009