Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/13/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/13/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/13/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/14/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/14/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/14/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/21/2009