Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/06/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/18/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/09/2009