Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/25/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/02/2009