Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/17/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/26/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/04/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/04/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/18/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/18/2010