Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/19/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/20/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/21/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/08/2009