Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/14/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/14/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/15/2009