Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/18/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/19/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/19/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2009